This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 07/26/2023 at 07:09:10 (UTC).

ARTANG REHABILITATION CENTER LLC VS PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 05/25/2023 ARTANG REHABILITATION CENTER LLC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, South Dade Justice Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-26

  • Filing Date:

    05/25/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Artang Rehabilitation Center Llc

Defendant

Progressive American Insurance Company

Assignee

Ania, Pupo

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Cavada, Derek L, ESQ

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

05/25/2023 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Statement of Claim

05/25/2023 - Statement of Claim

Email Notice:

05/25/2023 - Email Notice:

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

06/02/2023 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

06/08/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

06/12/2023 - Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

Notice of Service of Process

06/12/2023 - Notice of Service of Process

Voluntary Dismissal

06/30/2023 - Voluntary Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

06/30/2023

DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/30/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Book/Page: 33792:20; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/12/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Service of Process; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Progressive American Insurance Company

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/12/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/08/2023

DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/08/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 5. Parties: Progressive American Insurance Company

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/07/2023

DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3110234AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:CAVADA, DEREK L, ESQTHE CAVADA LAW FIRM, P.A. 7925 NW 12TH ST. SUITE 3DORAL FL 33126COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:06/07/2023REGISTER#:311CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/03/2023

DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3110162AMT PAID:$55.00NAME:CAVADA, DEREK L, ESQTHE CAVADA LAW FIRM, P.A. 7925 NW 12TH ST. SUITE 3DORAL FL 33126COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$55.00$55.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$55.00RECEIPT DATE:06/03/2023REGISTER#:311CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/02/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Email Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: EMAIL ADDRESS:

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less