This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 11/11/2023 at 13:33:09 (UTC).

UNLIMITED DIAGNOSTIC CENTER, INC. VS STAR CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 05/18/2023 UNLIMITED DIAGNOSTIC CENTER, INC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against STAR CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Hialeah District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-21

  • Filing Date:

    05/18/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UNLIMITED DIAGNOSTIC CENTER, INC.

Assignor

Crespo, Francisco

Defendant

STAR CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Abraham S. Ovadia

Defendant Attorneys

Barber, Cecilia Maria, ESQ

Steakley, Susan Marie

 

Court Documents

Motion to Compel

10/06/2023 - Motion to Compel

Motion to Compel

10/06/2023 - Motion to Compel

Motion to Compel

10/06/2023 - Motion to Compel

Motion to Compel

09/01/2023 - Motion to Compel

Request for Production

08/04/2023 - Request for Production

Request for Production

08/04/2023 - Request for Production

Motion to Compel

08/04/2023 - Motion to Compel

Motion to Compel

08/04/2023 - Motion to Compel

Reply to Affirmative Defenses

07/14/2023 - Reply to Affirmative Defenses

Answer and Affirmative Defense

07/11/2023 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

Notice of Service of Process

07/06/2023 - Notice of Service of Process

Notice of Filing:

07/06/2023 - Notice of Filing:

Motion for Extension of Time

07/05/2023 - Motion for Extension of Time

Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

06/05/2023 - Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

ESummons 20 Day Issued

06/01/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

05/23/2023 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

Email Notice:

05/18/2023 - Email Notice:

Request for Production

05/18/2023 - Request for Production

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

10/06/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Compel; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/06/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Compel; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/06/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Compel; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/01/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Compel; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/04/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/04/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/04/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Compel; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/04/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Compel; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/14/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Reply to Affirmative Defenses; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/11/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Answer and Affirmative Defense; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
06/01/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 8. Parties: STAR CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/25/2023

DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3120012AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:ABRAHAM S. OVADIA, ESQ.4800 N FEDERAL HWY STE 204DBOCA RATON FL 33431-3413COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:05/25/2023REGISTER#:312CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/23/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/20/2023

DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3210031AMT PAID:$55.00NAME:ABRAHAM S. OVADIA, ESQ.4800 N FEDERAL HWY STE 204DBOCA RATON FL 33431-3413COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$55.00$55.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$55.00RECEIPT DATE:05/20/2023REGISTER#:321CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/18/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Email Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: EMAIL ADDRESS:

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/18/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/18/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/18/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/18/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/18/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less