This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 09/17/2023 at 15:30:35 (UTC).

SPECIALIZED LOAN SERVICING LLC ET AL VS AMERICAN SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 05/26/2023 SPECIALIZED LOAN SERVICING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against AMERICAN SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SPECIALIZED LOAN SERVICING LLC

MAGARINO, NIDIA N

Defendant

AMERICAN SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Sanders, Magali J

Defendant Attorney

Ravelo, Amelia M

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

05/26/2023 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

05/26/2023 - Complaint

Request for Production

05/26/2023 - Request for Production

Notice of Interrogatory

05/26/2023 - Notice of Interrogatory

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

06/08/2023 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

06/15/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Notice of Appearance

07/17/2023 - Notice of Appearance

Email Notice:

07/17/2023 - Email Notice:

Notice of Appearance

07/17/2023 - Notice of Appearance

Email Notice:

07/17/2023 - Email Notice:

Motion for Extension of Time

08/01/2023 - Motion for Extension of Time

Order Extending Time for

08/08/2023 - Order Extending Time for

Order Setting CM Deadline

08/25/2023 - Order Setting CM Deadline

Notice of Change of Address

08/28/2023 - Notice of Change of Address

Motion for Extension of Time

08/28/2023 - Motion for Extension of Time

Answer and Affirmative Defense

08/31/2023 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

Notice:

09/05/2023 - Notice:

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: DROPPING PARTY PLAINTIFF ETC...

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer and Affirmative Defense; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: AMERICAN SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: SPECIALIZED LOAN SERVICING LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Change of Address; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order Setting CM Deadline; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order Extending Time for; Event Type: Event; Comments: RESPOND TO COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: AMERICAN SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Email Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: FLSERVICE1@WFSLAW.COM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Ravelo Amelia M; AMERICAN SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Email Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: FLSERVICE1@WFSLAW.COM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 7. Parties: AMERICAN SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3020188AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:SANDERS, MAGALI J2665 S. BAYSHORE DRIVE, SUITE 601COCONUT GROVE FL 33133-5401COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:06/14/2023REGISTER#:302CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3080209AMT PAID:$401.00NAME:SANDERS, MAGALI J2665 S. BAYSHORE DRIVE, SUITE 601COCONUT GROVE FL 33133-5401COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$401.00RECEIPT DATE:05/27/2023REGISTER#:308CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less