This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 09/04/2023 at 08:35:53 (UTC).

PRESGAR IMAGING OF CMI SOUTH, L.C. VS ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 05/30/2023 PRESGAR IMAGING OF CMI SOUTH, L C filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Hialeah District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-21

  • Filing Date:

    05/30/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PRESGAR IMAGING OF CMI SOUTH, L.C.

Assignor

Palma, Priscila

Defendant

ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gregory E Gudin

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

05/30/2023 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Statement of Claim

05/30/2023 - Statement of Claim

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

07/07/2023 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

07/17/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

07/17/2023 - Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 4. Parties: ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3190297AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:GREGORY E GUDINLANDAU & ASSOCIATES PA 1619 NW 136TH AVE SUITE 2CSUNRISE FL 33323COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:07/12/2023REGISTER#:319CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3140164AMT PAID:$80.00NAME:GREGORY E GUDINLANDAU & ASSOCIATES PA 1619 NW 136TH AVE SUITE 2CSUNRISE FL 33323COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$80.00$80.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$80.00RECEIPT DATE:05/31/2023REGISTER#:314CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less