This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 11/21/2023 at 01:40:15 (UTC).

SAMUEL PEREZ ET AL VS UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 07/28/2023 SAMUEL PEREZ filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against UNIVERSAL PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    07/28/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PEREZ, SAMUEL

LOPEZ, ELBA

Defendant

UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Suls, Matthew S, ESQ

Defendant Attorneys

Badger, Royce B.

Ram, Samantha D., ESQ

 

Court Documents

Complaint

07/28/2023 - Complaint

Motion for Extension of Time

11/06/2023 - Motion for Extension of Time

Notice:

11/06/2023 - Notice:

Motion to Compel

11/06/2023 - Motion to Compel

Motion to Compel

10/26/2023 - Motion to Compel

Order Setting CM Deadline

10/02/2023 - Order Setting CM Deadline

Notice of Unavailability/absence

09/26/2023 - Notice of Unavailability/absence

Motion for Extension of Time

09/26/2023 - Motion for Extension of Time

Notice of Compliance

09/21/2023 - Notice of Compliance

Notice:

09/05/2023 - Notice:

Answer and Demand for Jury Trial

08/25/2023 - Answer and Demand for Jury Trial

Notice of Interrogatory

08/17/2023 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Production

08/17/2023 - Request for Production

Request for Admissions

08/17/2023 - Request for Admissions

Notice of Appearance

08/17/2023 - Notice of Appearance

Notice of Service of Process

08/07/2023 - Notice of Service of Process

ESummons 20 Day Issued

07/31/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

07/31/2023 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

11/06/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: PEREZ SAMUEL; LOPEZ ELBA

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/06/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: OF RELIANCE ON TECHNICAL ADMISSIONS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/06/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Compel; Event Type: Event; Comments: DISCOVERY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/26/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Compel; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/02/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Order Setting CM Deadline; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Unavailability/absence; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: PEREZ SAMUEL; LOPEZ ELBA

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Compliance; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/05/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DANIS INDUSTRIES OFFER LETTER TOPLAINTIFF

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Answer and Demand for Jury Trial; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
07/31/2023

DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/31/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 9. Parties: UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/31/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/29/2023

DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3090113AMT PAID:$401.00NAME:SULS, MATTHEW S, ESQPROPERTY LITIGATION GROUP, PLLC 2750 SW 145TH AVENCOMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$401.00RECEIPT DATE:07/29/2023REGISTER#:309CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/28/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/28/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/28/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/28/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Email Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: SERVICE@PLGLAWYERSFL.COM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/28/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/28/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less