This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 09/20/2023 at 08:36:18 (UTC).

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY VS FRANCISCO CHIRINOS URBINA ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/26/2023 STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against FRANCISCO CHIRINOS URBINA. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

Defendants

Urbina, Francisco Chirinos

Soto, Eduardo

Not Classified By Court

Shannon, Maya

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Troy R. Lotane, Esquire

Defendant Attorneys

Alfonso, Jorge R., Jr

Bejamin L Bedard

Breeden, Ann G

 

Court Documents

Complaint

05/26/2023 - Complaint

Order Setting CM Deadline

08/24/2023 - Order Setting CM Deadline

Motion:

08/15/2023 - Motion:

Privilege Log

07/28/2023 - Privilege Log

Response to Request for Production

07/28/2023 - Response to Request for Production

Notice of Compliance

07/28/2023 - Notice of Compliance

Notice of Appearance

07/13/2023 - Notice of Appearance

Notice of Unavailability/absence

07/13/2023 - Notice of Unavailability/absence

Request for Production

07/12/2023 - Request for Production

Notice of Interrogatory

07/12/2023 - Notice of Interrogatory

Answer and Demand for Jury Trial

07/12/2023 - Answer and Demand for Jury Trial

Answer and Demand for Jury Trial

07/12/2023 - Answer and Demand for Jury Trial

Motion for Extension of Time

06/29/2023 - Motion for Extension of Time

Notice of Appearance

06/29/2023 - Notice of Appearance

Motion for Extension of Time

06/27/2023 - Motion for Extension of Time

Email Notice:

06/27/2023 - Email Notice:

Notice of Unavailability/absence

06/27/2023 - Notice of Unavailability/absence

Notice of Appearance

06/27/2023 - Notice of Appearance

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order Setting CM Deadline; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion:; Event Type: Event; Comments: REQUESTING COURT ORDERED MEDIATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Privilege Log; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response to Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Compliance; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Bejamin L Bedard; Breeden Ann G; Urbina Francisco Chirinos; Soto Eduardo

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Unavailability/absence; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer and Demand for Jury Trial; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 06/05/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 6. Parties: Urbina Francisco Chirinos

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 5. Parties: Soto Eduardo

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3060089AMT PAID:$20.00NAME:TROY R. LOTANE, ESQUIRE1980 MICHIGAN AVECOCOA FL 32922-5729COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.003139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$20.00RECEIPT DATE:06/02/2023REGISTER#:306CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3080178AMT PAID:$401.00NAME:TROY R. LOTANE, ESQUIRE1980 MICHIGAN AVECOCOA FL 32922-5729COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$401.00RECEIPT DATE:05/27/2023REGISTER#:308CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less