This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 08/29/2023 at 15:31:34 (UTC).

PEDRO J. GARCIA, AS PROPERTY APPRAISER OF MIAMI VS LENOX 429 AVE INC. ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/26/2023 PEDRO J GARCIA, AS PROPERTY APPRAISER OF MIAMI filed an Other - Writ Of Mandamus lawsuit against LENOX 429 AVE INC. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Writ Of Mandamus

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PEDRO J. GARCIA, as Property Appraiser of Miami

Defendants

LENOX 429 AVE INC.

JIM ZINGALE, as Executive Director of the State

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Bonzon-Keenan, Geraldine Teresa

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

07/26/2023 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

07/26/2023 - Complaint

Lis Pendens

07/26/2023 - Lis Pendens

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

08/22/2023 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

08/23/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

 

Docket Entries

08/23/2023

DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/23/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 7. Parties: LENOX 429 AVE INC.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/23/2023

DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3250130AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:BONZON-KEENAN, GERALDINE TERESA111 NW 1ST ST STE 2800MIAMI FL 33128-1930COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:08/23/2023REGISTER#:325CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/22/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/27/2023

DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3090265AMT PAID:$410.00NAME:BONZON-KEENAN, GERALDINE TERESA111 NW 1ST ST STE 2800MIAMI FL 33128-1930COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.003142-RECORDING FEE1$4.00$4.003142-RECORDING FEE1$5.00$5.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$410.00RECEIPT DATE:07/27/2023REGISTER#:309CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/26/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Lis Pendens; Book/Page: 33819:3718; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/26/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/26/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less