This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 09/27/2023 at 03:23:54 (UTC).

FLORIDA SPINE & ORTHOPEDICS, INC VS GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 05/24/2023 FLORIDA SPINE ORTHOPEDICS, INC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Hialeah District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-21

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FLORIDA SPINE & ORTHOPEDICS, INC

Assignor

Ovadya, Oren

Defendant

GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Abraham S. Ovadia

Defendant Attorney

Rosenberg, Michael

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

05/24/2023 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Statement of Claim

05/24/2023 - Statement of Claim

Notice of Interrogatory

05/24/2023 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Production

05/24/2023 - Request for Production

Request for Admissions

05/24/2023 - Request for Admissions

Email Notice:

05/24/2023 - Email Notice:

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

05/26/2023 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

06/09/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

06/11/2023 - Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

Notice of Appearance

07/11/2023 - Notice of Appearance

Notice of Filing:

07/12/2023 - Notice of Filing:

Service Returned

07/12/2023 - Service Returned

Answer and Affirmative Defense

07/25/2023 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

Reply to Affirmative Defenses

07/28/2023 - Reply to Affirmative Defenses

Motion for Extension of Time

08/18/2023 - Motion for Extension of Time

Response to Request for Admissions

08/18/2023 - Response to Request for Admissions

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response to Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Reply to Affirmative Defenses; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer and Affirmative Defense; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Filing:; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 8. Parties: GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3140029AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:ABRAHAM S. OVADIA, ESQ.4800 N FEDERAL HWY STE 204DBOCA RATON FL 33431-3413COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:05/31/2023REGISTER#:314CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3120239AMT PAID:$55.00NAME:ABRAHAM S. OVADIA, ESQ.4800 N FEDERAL HWY STE 204DBOCA RATON FL 33431-3413COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$55.00$55.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$55.00RECEIPT DATE:05/25/2023REGISTER#:312CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Email Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: EMAIL ADDRESS:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less