*************P-26
05/24/2023
Disposed - Other Disposed
Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Miami-Dade, Florida
All X Ray Diagnostic Services Corp
Progressive Select Insurance Company
Ainadi, Quintana
Cavada, Derek L, ESQ
05/24/2023 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount
05/24/2023 - Statement of Claim
05/24/2023 - Email Notice:
06/01/2023 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received
06/08/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued
06/12/2023 - Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements
06/12/2023 - Notice of Service of Process
06/23/2023 - Voluntary Dismissal
DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Book/Page: 33782:4921; Event Type: Event
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Notice of Service of Process; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Progressive Select Insurance Company
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements; Event Type: Event
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 4. Parties: Progressive Select Insurance Company
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3020199AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:CAVADA, DEREK L, ESQTHE CAVADA LAW FIRM, P.A. 7925 NW 12TH ST. SUITE 3DORAL FL 33126COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:06/02/2023REGISTER#:302CASHIER:EFILINGUSER
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3020032AMT PAID:$55.00NAME:CAVADA, DEREK L, ESQTHE CAVADA LAW FIRM, P.A. 7925 NW 12TH ST. SUITE 3DORAL FL 33126COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$55.00$55.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$55.00RECEIPT DATE:06/02/2023REGISTER#:302CASHIER:EFILINGUSER
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Email Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: EMAIL ADDRESS:
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event
[-] Read Less