This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 06/30/2023 at 05:59:53 (UTC).

PALM BEACH CHIROPRACTIC & REHABILITATION, INC. VS PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 05/22/2023 PALM BEACH CHIROPRACTIC REHABILITATION, INC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-05

  • Filing Date:

    05/22/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Palm Beach Chiropractic & Rehabilitation, Inc.

Defendant

Progressive Select Insurance Company

Assignee

Singletary, Elishah

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael Fischetti

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

05/22/2023 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Statement of Claim

05/22/2023 - Statement of Claim

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

05/22/2023 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

05/30/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Notice of Service of Process

06/02/2023 - Notice of Service of Process

Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

06/05/2023 - Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

Motion for Extension of Time

06/15/2023 - Motion for Extension of Time

Voluntary Dismissal

06/26/2023 - Voluntary Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

06/26/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Book/Page: 33773:631; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Progressive Select Insurance Company

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/26/2023

DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Progressive Select Insurance Company

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/05/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/02/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Service of Process; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/30/2023

DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/30/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 4. Parties: Progressive Select Insurance Company

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/26/2023

DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3050090AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:MICHAEL FISCHETTIFISCHETTI LAW GROUP MICHAEL J FISCHETTI, ESQ 7593BOYNTON BEACH FL 33437COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:05/26/2023REGISTER#:305CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/23/2023

DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3150213AMT PAID:$55.00NAME:MICHAEL FISCHETTIFISCHETTI LAW GROUP MICHAEL J FISCHETTI, ESQ 7593BOYNTON BEACH FL 33437COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$55.00$55.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$55.00RECEIPT DATE:05/23/2023REGISTER#:315CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/22/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/22/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/22/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less