This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 09/09/2023 at 02:05:28 (UTC).

SERGIO VILLET VS ALBERTO SALVADOR ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/20/2023 SERGIO VILLET filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ALBERTO SALVADOR. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    03/20/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Villet, Sergio

Defendants

Salvador, Alberto

Synergy Recycling LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jorge J Garcia

Defendant Attorneys

Aguero, Amanda M

Scott D Kirschbaum

 

Court Documents

Motion for Leave

07/05/2023 - Motion for Leave

Motion for Extension of Time

06/22/2023 - Motion for Extension of Time

Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

07/07/2023 - Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

Motion to Strike

07/03/2023 - Motion to Strike

Motion to Dismiss

06/12/2023 - Motion to Dismiss

Affidavit of Service

05/31/2023 - Affidavit of Service

Answer and Demand for Jury Trial

06/12/2023 - Answer and Demand for Jury Trial

Complaint

03/20/2023 - Complaint

Response:

08/22/2023 - Response:

Response to Motion

08/21/2023 - Response to Motion

Order Setting CM Deadline

08/20/2023 - Order Setting CM Deadline

Notice of Taking Deposition

08/14/2023 - Notice of Taking Deposition

Response to Request for Production

07/07/2023 - Response to Request for Production

Response to Request for Admissions

07/07/2023 - Response to Request for Admissions

Notice of Filing:

07/05/2023 - Notice of Filing:

Notice of Hearing-

07/03/2023 - Notice of Hearing-

Summons Returned - No Service

06/22/2023 - Summons Returned - No Service

Notice of Appearance

06/22/2023 - Notice of Appearance

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/22/2023
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: MOTCAL; Hearing Time: 9:00AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response:; Event Type: Event; Comments: PLAINTIFF'S REPLY TO DEFENDANT, SYNERGY RECYCLING LLC'S RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE PURPORTED DEFENSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion Calendar; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANT'S PURPORTED DEFENSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response to Motion; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order Setting CM Deadline; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Taking Deposition; Event Type: Event; Comments: OCTOBER 10, 2023 AT 10:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response to Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Answer to Interrogatories; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response to Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Filing:; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 05/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3190161AMT PAID:$401.00NAME:JORGE J GARCIA2800 PONCE DE LEON BLVD STE 800CORAL GABLES FL 33134-6913COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$401.00RECEIPT DATE:03/28/2023REGISTER#:319CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less