This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 08/31/2023 at 11:26:24 (UTC).

GELKYS DELGADO ET AL VS EDISON INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 08/02/2023 GELKYS DELGADO filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against EDISON INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    08/02/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DELGADO, GELKYS

GARCIA, EUGENIO

Defendant

EDISON INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lopez, Anthony M

Defendant Attorneys

Gowani, Sobia

Salehi, Tanaz, ESQ

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

08/02/2023 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

08/02/2023 - Complaint

Notice of Interrogatory

08/02/2023 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Production

08/02/2023 - Request for Production

Notice of Taking Deposition

08/02/2023 - Notice of Taking Deposition

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

08/04/2023 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

08/07/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Notice of Service of Process

08/10/2023 - Notice of Service of Process

Notice of Appearance

08/15/2023 - Notice of Appearance

Email Notice:

08/15/2023 - Email Notice:

Email Notice:

08/17/2023 - Email Notice:

Notice of Appearance

08/17/2023 - Notice of Appearance

Notice of Interrogatory

08/30/2023 - Notice of Interrogatory

Notice of Interrogatory

08/30/2023 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Production

08/30/2023 - Request for Production

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

08/30/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/30/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/30/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/17/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Salehi Tanaz ESQ; EDISON INSURANCE COMPANY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/17/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Email Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: TSALEHI@SALEHIBOYER.COM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Email Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: PRIMARY: OLOMBANA@SALEHIBOYER.COM AND SGOWANI@SALEHIBOYER.COM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Gowani Sobia; EDISON INSURANCE COMPANY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/10/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Service of Process; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/08/2023

DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3160047AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:LOPEZ, ANTHONY M2601 SOUTH BAYSHORE DRIVE 18TH FLOORCOCONUT GROVE FL 33133COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:08/08/2023REGISTER#:316CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/07/2023

DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/07/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 8. Parties: EDISON INSURANCE COMPANY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/04/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/03/2023

DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3120149AMT PAID:$401.00NAME:LOPEZ, ANTHONY M2601 SOUTH BAYSHORE DRIVE 18TH FLOORCOCONUT GROVE FL 33133COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$401.00RECEIPT DATE:08/03/2023REGISTER#:312CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/02/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Taking Deposition; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/02/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/02/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/02/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/02/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less