This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 09/13/2023 at 20:43:52 (UTC).

UNIVERSITY DIAGNOSTIC INSTITUTE, LTD VS STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 05/22/2023 UNIVERSITY DIAGNOSTIC INSTITUTE, LTD filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami Beach District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-24

  • Filing Date:

    05/22/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UNIVERSITY DIAGNOSTIC INSTITUTE, LTD

Defendant

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Assignee

JOHNSON, ZARIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Greg Blackburn

Defendant Attorney

Podolsky, Michael R.

 

Court Documents

Motion for Extension of Time

07/17/2023 - Motion for Extension of Time

Motion for Extension of Time

06/20/2023 - Motion for Extension of Time

Demand for Jury Trial

06/01/2023 - Demand for Jury Trial

Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

05/29/2023 - Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

Order Extending Time for

07/18/2023 - Order Extending Time for

Order Extending Time for

07/18/2023 - Order Extending Time for

Motion for Extension of Time

07/17/2023 - Motion for Extension of Time

Motion for Leave

06/13/2023 - Motion for Leave

Motion for Leave

06/13/2023 - Motion for Leave

Notice of Interrogatory

06/13/2023 - Notice of Interrogatory

Notice of Interrogatory

06/13/2023 - Notice of Interrogatory

Notice of Interrogatory

06/13/2023 - Notice of Interrogatory

Supplemental Request to Produce

06/13/2023 - Supplemental Request to Produce

Supplemental Request to Produce

06/13/2023 - Supplemental Request to Produce

Supplemental Request to Produce

06/13/2023 - Supplemental Request to Produce

Request for Admissions

06/13/2023 - Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

06/13/2023 - Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

06/13/2023 - Request for Admissions

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order Extending Time for; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order Extending Time for; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event; Comments: DEFENDANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event; Comments: RELATEDNESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event; Comments: REASONABLENESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event; Comments: APPLICATION OF THE DEDUCTIBLE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Supplemental Request to Produce; Event Type: Event; Comments: RELATEDNESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Supplemental Request to Produce; Event Type: Event; Comments: REASONABLENESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 06/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Service of Process; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 4. Parties: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3160033AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:GREG BLACKBURN3333 W COMMERCIAL BLVD STE 200BFORT LAUDERDALE FL 33309COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:05/25/2023REGISTER#:316CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3220003AMT PAID:$175.00NAME:GREG BLACKBURN3333 W COMMERCIAL BLVD STE 200BFORT LAUDERDALE FL 33309COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$175.00$175.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$175.00RECEIPT DATE:05/24/2023REGISTER#:322CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less