This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 11/10/2023 at 17:28:01 (UTC).

COMPETENT GROUP SERVICES INC VS INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 05/16/2023 COMPETENT GROUP SERVICES INC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Coral Gables District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-25

  • Filing Date:

    05/16/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COMPETENT GROUP SERVICES INC

Defendant

INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY

Assignee

GONZALEZ SARDINA, YARELIS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Antonella Dos Santos

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

05/16/2023 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Statement of Claim

05/16/2023 - Statement of Claim

Reassignment Pursuant to Administrative Order

06/21/2023 - Reassignment Pursuant to Administrative Order

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

08/14/2023 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

08/16/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

08/20/2023 - Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

Request for Admissions

08/24/2023 - Request for Admissions

Request for Production

08/24/2023 - Request for Production

Notice of Interrogatory

08/24/2023 - Notice of Interrogatory

Notice:

08/24/2023 - Notice:

Email Notice:

08/24/2023 - Email Notice:

 

Docket Entries

08/24/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Email Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: EMAIL ADDRESS:

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/24/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/24/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/24/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/24/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/20/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/16/2023

DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/16/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 5. Parties: INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/16/2023

DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3080993AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:ANTONELLA DOS SANTOSDOS SANTOS LAW, P.A. 7480 BIRD ROAD, SUITE 740MIAMI FL 33144COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:08/16/2023REGISTER#:308CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/14/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/21/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Reassignment Pursuant to Administrative Order; Event Type: Event; Comments: AO 23-5

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/20/2023

DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3240167AMT PAID:$80.00NAME:ANTONELLA DOS SANTOSDOS SANTOS LAW, P.A. 7480 BIRD ROAD, SUITE 740MIAMI FL 33144COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$80.00$80.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$80.00RECEIPT DATE:05/20/2023REGISTER#:324CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/16/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event; Comments: $500.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/16/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less