This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 09/06/2023 at 13:14:05 (UTC).

JORGE RAUL BARBEITO VS UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 04/18/2023 JORGE RAUL BARBEITO filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against UNIVERSAL PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    04/18/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BARBEITO, JORGE RAUL

Defendant

UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Leo A Manzanilla

Defendant Attorneys

Negreira, Jose

Perales, Analise

DeMahy, Danielle K

 

Court Documents

Motion to Strike

05/12/2023 - Motion to Strike

Answer and Demand for Jury Trial

05/09/2023 - Answer and Demand for Jury Trial

Complaint

04/18/2023 - Complaint

Order Setting CM Deadline

08/21/2023 - Order Setting CM Deadline

Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

08/18/2023 - Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

Order Granting Motion to Compel

08/08/2023 - Order Granting Motion to Compel

Motion to Compel

08/08/2023 - Motion to Compel

Notice Of Serving Proposal For Settlement

07/27/2023 - Notice Of Serving Proposal For Settlement

Notice of Unavailability/absence

07/21/2023 - Notice of Unavailability/absence

Notice of Appearance

07/21/2023 - Notice of Appearance

Notice of Appearance

07/12/2023 - Notice of Appearance

Response to Request for Production

07/07/2023 - Response to Request for Production

Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

07/07/2023 - Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

Notice Of Serving Proposal For Settlement

06/29/2023 - Notice Of Serving Proposal For Settlement

Response to Request for Admissions

06/19/2023 - Response to Request for Admissions

Notice of Compliance

06/07/2023 - Notice of Compliance

Notice:

05/23/2023 - Notice:

Notice of Appearance

05/10/2023 - Notice of Appearance

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

08/21/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Order Setting CM Deadline; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/18/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Answer to Interrogatories; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/08/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Order Granting Motion to Compel; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/08/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Compel; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/27/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Notice Of Serving Proposal For Settlement; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/21/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Unavailability/absence; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/21/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Perales Analise; BARBEITO JORGERAUL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/12/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: DeMahy Danielle K; UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/07/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Response to Request for Production; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/07/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Answer to Interrogatories; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12 More Docket Entries
04/20/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 9. Parties: UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/20/2023

DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3090084AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:LEO A MANZANILLA770 PONCE DE LEON BLVD STE 101CORAL GABLES FL 33134-2066COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:04/20/2023REGISTER#:309CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/19/2023

DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3120232AMT PAID:$401.00NAME:LEO A MANZANILLA770 PONCE DE LEON BLVD STE 101CORAL GABLES FL 33134-2066COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$401.00RECEIPT DATE:04/19/2023REGISTER#:312CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/18/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/18/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/18/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/18/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/18/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/18/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/18/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less