This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 05/29/2023 at 13:43:55 (UTC).

LANE FAMILY CHIROPRACTIC INC AAO DIVYA BHATT VS STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 04/05/2023 LANE FAMILY CHIROPRACTIC INC AAO DIVYA BHATT filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Coral Gables District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-25

  • Filing Date:

    04/05/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lane Family Chiropractic Inc Aao Divya Bhatt

Defendant

State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Poulopoulos, Theophilos G

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

04/05/2023 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Statement of Claim

04/05/2023 - Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim

04/05/2023 - Statement of Claim

Notice of Interrogatory

04/05/2023 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Production

04/05/2023 - Request for Production

Request for Admissions

04/05/2023 - Request for Admissions

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

04/07/2023 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

04/14/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Notice of Service of Process

04/20/2023 - Notice of Service of Process

Motion for Extension of Time

05/08/2023 - Motion for Extension of Time

Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

05/23/2023 - Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Service of Process; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 8. Parties: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3110198AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:POULOPOULOS, THEOPHILOS G9130 S DADELAND BLVD STE 1902MIAMI FL 33156-7858COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:04/12/2023REGISTER#:311CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3120089AMT PAID:$55.00NAME:POULOPOULOS, THEOPHILOS G9130 S DADELAND BLVD STE 1902MIAMI FL 33156-7858COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$55.00$55.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$55.00RECEIPT DATE:04/08/2023REGISTER#:312CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event; Comments: $99.99

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less