This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 09/21/2023 at 04:29:25 (UTC).

PRESGAR IMAGING OF CMI NORTH, LC VS STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 03/20/2023 PRESGAR IMAGING OF CMI NORTH, LC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Coral Gables District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-25

  • Filing Date:

    03/20/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PRESGAR IMAGING OF CMI NORTH, LC

Assignor

METELLUS, EMERLINE

Defendant

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Myones, Howard

Defendant Attorney

Espinoza, Paola

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

03/20/2023 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Statement of Claim

03/20/2023 - Statement of Claim

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

05/15/2023 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

05/23/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

05/28/2023 - Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

Reassignment Pursuant to Administrative Order

06/21/2023 - Reassignment Pursuant to Administrative Order

Notice of Service of Process

08/12/2023 - Notice of Service of Process

Demand for Jury Trial

09/01/2023 - Demand for Jury Trial

Motion for Extension of Time

09/01/2023 - Motion for Extension of Time

Notice of Appearance

09/01/2023 - Notice of Appearance

Email Notice:

09/01/2023 - Email Notice:

Request for Production

09/12/2023 - Request for Production

Notice of Interrogatory

09/12/2023 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Admissions

09/12/2023 - Request for Admissions

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Email Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: EMAIL ADDRESS:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Demand for Jury Trial; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Service of Process; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Reassignment Pursuant to Administrative Order; Event Type: Event; Comments: AO 23-5

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 4. Parties: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3230732AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:MYONES, HOWARD1005 W STATE ROAD 84 SUITE 514FORT LAUDERDALE FL 33315COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:05/17/2023REGISTER#:323CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3121301AMT PAID:$55.00NAME:MYONES, HOWARD1005 W STATE ROAD 84 SUITE 514FORT LAUDERDALE FL 33315COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$55.00$55.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$55.00RECEIPT DATE:03/22/2023REGISTER#:312CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event; Comments: 99.99

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less