This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 10/02/2023 at 08:49:19 (UTC).

ADVANCED ORTHOPEDICS & SPINE SURGERY, LLC VS GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 05/31/2023 ADVANCED ORTHOPEDICS SPINE SURGERY, LLC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Hialeah District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-21

  • Filing Date:

    05/31/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ADVANCED ORTHOPEDICS & SPINE SURGERY, LLC

Assignor

Zevallos, Yolanda

Defendant

GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Abraham S. Ovadia

Defendant Attorney

Hinton, Nikita Correia

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

05/31/2023 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Statement of Claim

05/31/2023 - Statement of Claim

Notice of Interrogatory

05/31/2023 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Production

05/31/2023 - Request for Production

Request for Admissions

05/31/2023 - Request for Admissions

Notice:

05/31/2023 - Notice:

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

06/05/2023 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

06/12/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

06/12/2023 - Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

Motion to Dismiss

07/25/2023 - Motion to Dismiss

Notice of Filing:

07/27/2023 - Notice of Filing:

Service Returned

07/27/2023 - Service Returned

Voluntary Dismissal

09/26/2023 - Voluntary Dismissal

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

09/26/2023

DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Book/Page: 33904:4262; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/27/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/27/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Filing:; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Dismiss; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/12/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/12/2023

DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/12/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 8. Parties: GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/07/2023

DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3090297AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:ABRAHAM S. OVADIA, ESQ.4800 N FEDERAL HWY STE 204DBOCA RATON FL 33431-3413COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:06/07/2023REGISTER#:309CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/05/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/02/2023

DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3100100AMT PAID:$55.00NAME:ABRAHAM S. OVADIA, ESQ.4800 N FEDERAL HWY STE 204DBOCA RATON FL 33431-3413COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$55.00$55.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$55.00RECEIPT DATE:06/02/2023REGISTER#:310CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/31/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/31/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/31/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/31/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/31/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/31/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less