This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 07/14/2023 at 12:46:25 (UTC).

PALM BEACH CHIROPRACTIC & REHABILITATION, INC. VS STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 05/30/2023 PALM BEACH CHIROPRACTIC REHABILITATION, INC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-05

  • Filing Date:

    05/30/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Palm Beach Chiropractic & Rehabilitation, Inc.

Defendant

State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

Assignee

Serio, Jessica Antoinrtte

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael Fischetti

Defendant Attorney

Dichek, Jarred S

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

05/30/2023 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Statement of Claim

05/30/2023 - Statement of Claim

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

06/01/2023 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

06/07/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Notice of Service of Process

06/09/2023 - Notice of Service of Process

Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

06/12/2023 - Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

Notice of Appearance

06/30/2023 - Notice of Appearance

Motion for Extension of Time

06/30/2023 - Motion for Extension of Time

 

Docket Entries

06/30/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/30/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/12/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/09/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Service of Process; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/07/2023

DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/07/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 4. Parties: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/03/2023

DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3140267AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:MICHAEL FISCHETTIFISCHETTI LAW GROUP MICHAEL J FISCHETTI, ESQ 7593BOYNTON BEACH FL 33437COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:06/03/2023REGISTER#:314CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/02/2023

DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3070035AMT PAID:$55.00NAME:MICHAEL FISCHETTIFISCHETTI LAW GROUP MICHAEL J FISCHETTI, ESQ 7593BOYNTON BEACH FL 33437COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$55.00$55.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$55.00RECEIPT DATE:06/02/2023REGISTER#:307CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/01/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/30/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/30/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less