This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 08/18/2023 at 05:23:39 (UTC).

NORGUARD INSURANCE COMPANY VS CONSTRUCTION SERVICE PARTNERS LLC

Case Summary

On 05/12/2023 NORGUARD INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CONSTRUCTION SERVICE PARTNERS LLC. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    05/12/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NORGUARD INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

CONSTRUCTION SERVICE PARTNERS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Fisher, Stacey S

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

05/12/2023 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

05/12/2023 - Complaint

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

05/17/2023 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

05/24/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Service Returned

06/08/2023 - Service Returned

Motion for Default

06/28/2023 - Motion for Default

Default

06/29/2023 - Default

Final Disposition Document

08/02/2023 - Final Disposition Document

Affidavit of Proof(claim)

08/02/2023 - Affidavit of Proof(claim)

Affidavit as to Interest

08/02/2023 - Affidavit as to Interest

Affidavit as to Costs

08/02/2023 - Affidavit as to Costs

Default Final Judgment

08/11/2023 - Default Final Judgment

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/15/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Default Final Judgment; Event Type: Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Default Final Judgment; Book/Page: 33839:3930; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: CONSTRUCTION SERVICE PARTNERS LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Affidavit as to Costs; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Affidavit as to Interest; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Affidavit of Proof(claim); Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Final Disposition Document; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Default; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: CONSTRUCTION SERVICE PARTNERS LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Default; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 5. Parties: CONSTRUCTION SERVICE PARTNERS LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3130088AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:FISHER, STACEY S2775 NE 163RD ST STE 100NORTH MIAMI BEACH FL 33160-407COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:05/23/2023REGISTER#:313CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3210213AMT PAID:$401.00NAME:FISHER, STACEY S2775 NE 163RD ST STE 100NORTH MIAMI BEACH FL 33160-407COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$401.00RECEIPT DATE:05/16/2023REGISTER#:321CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less