*************A-01
05/12/2023
Disposed - Other Disposed
Contract - Debt Collection
Miami-Dade, Florida
NORGUARD INSURANCE COMPANY
CONSTRUCTION SERVICE PARTNERS LLC
Fisher, Stacey S
05/12/2023 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount
05/12/2023 - Complaint
05/17/2023 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received
05/24/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued
06/08/2023 - Service Returned
06/28/2023 - Motion for Default
06/29/2023 - Default
08/02/2023 - Final Disposition Document
08/02/2023 - Affidavit of Proof(claim)
08/02/2023 - Affidavit as to Interest
08/02/2023 - Affidavit as to Costs
08/11/2023 - Default Final Judgment
DocketDocket Entry: Default Final Judgment; Event Type: Judgment
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Default Final Judgment; Book/Page: 33839:3930; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: CONSTRUCTION SERVICE PARTNERS LLC
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Affidavit as to Costs; Event Type: Event
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Affidavit as to Interest; Event Type: Event
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Affidavit of Proof(claim); Event Type: Event
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Final Disposition Document; Event Type: Event
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Default; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: CONSTRUCTION SERVICE PARTNERS LLC
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Motion for Default; Event Type: Event
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 5. Parties: CONSTRUCTION SERVICE PARTNERS LLC
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3130088AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:FISHER, STACEY S2775 NE 163RD ST STE 100NORTH MIAMI BEACH FL 33160-407COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:05/23/2023REGISTER#:313CASHIER:EFILINGUSER
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3210213AMT PAID:$401.00NAME:FISHER, STACEY S2775 NE 163RD ST STE 100NORTH MIAMI BEACH FL 33160-407COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$401.00RECEIPT DATE:05/16/2023REGISTER#:321CASHIER:EFILINGUSER
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event
[-] Read Less