This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 09/15/2023 at 23:19:31 (UTC).

MANUEL V.FEIJOO, M. D.,P.A VS IMPERIAL FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 05/10/2023 MANUEL filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against FEIJOO, M D ,P A. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami Beach District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-24

  • Filing Date:

    05/10/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MANUEL V.FEIJOO, M. D.,P.A

Defendant

IMPERIAL FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Assignee

AGUIRRE, ANDRES HELIODORO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Antonella Dos Santos

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

05/10/2023 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Statement of Claim

05/10/2023 - Statement of Claim

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

08/11/2023 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

08/16/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

08/17/2023 - Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

Request for Admissions

08/18/2023 - Request for Admissions

Response to Request for Production

08/18/2023 - Response to Request for Production

Notice of Interrogatory

08/18/2023 - Notice of Interrogatory

Notice:

08/18/2023 - Notice:

Email Notice:

08/18/2023 - Email Notice:

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Email Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: EMAIL ADDRESS:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response to Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 4. Parties: IMPERIAL FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3180010AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:ANTONELLA DOS SANTOSDOS SANTOS LAW, P.A. 7480 BIRD ROAD, SUITE 740MIAMI FL 33144COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:08/15/2023REGISTER#:318CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3190071AMT PAID:$55.00NAME:ANTONELLA DOS SANTOSDOS SANTOS LAW, P.A. 7480 BIRD ROAD, SUITE 740MIAMI FL 33144COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$55.00$55.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$55.00RECEIPT DATE:05/12/2023REGISTER#:319CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less