This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 11/17/2023 at 18:13:00 (UTC).

OAKS WELLNESS CENTER, INC. VS UNITED AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 05/15/2023 OAKS WELLNESS CENTER, INC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against UNITED AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Coral Gables District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-25

  • Filing Date:

    05/15/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OAKS WELLNESS CENTER, INC.

Assignor

Hernandez, Yasmany

Defendant

United Automobile Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

John C Daly

Defendant Attorney

Zamora, Sandra

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

05/15/2023 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Statement of Claim

05/15/2023 - Statement of Claim

Reassignment Pursuant to Administrative Order

06/21/2023 - Reassignment Pursuant to Administrative Order

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

07/17/2023 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

07/21/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

07/23/2023 - Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

Motion for Extension of Time

08/28/2023 - Motion for Extension of Time

Notice of Service of Process

09/19/2023 - Notice of Service of Process

Request for Production

09/19/2023 - Request for Production

Notice of Interrogatory

09/19/2023 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Admissions

09/19/2023 - Request for Admissions

Notice of Filing:

09/19/2023 - Notice of Filing:

Notice of Filing Deposition

09/19/2023 - Notice of Filing Deposition

Answer and Affirmative Defense

10/05/2023 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

10/05/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Answer and Affirmative Defense; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/19/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Filing Deposition; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/19/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Filing:; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/19/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/19/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/19/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/19/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Service of Process; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: United Automobile Insurance Company

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/28/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/23/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/21/2023

DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/21/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 5. Parties: United Automobile Insurance Company

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/21/2023

DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3140220AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:JOHN C DALY1380 N. UNIVERSITY DRIVE, SUITE 200PLANTATION FL 33322COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:07/21/2023REGISTER#:314CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/17/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/21/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Reassignment Pursuant to Administrative Order; Event Type: Event; Comments: AO 23-5

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/17/2023

DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3230495AMT PAID:$55.00NAME:JOHN C DALY1380 N. UNIVERSITY DRIVE, SUITE 200PLANTATION FL 33322COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$55.00$55.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$55.00RECEIPT DATE:05/17/2023REGISTER#:323CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event; Comments: $99.99

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less