This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 06/25/2023 at 01:48:53 (UTC).

AJX MORTGAGE TRUST I, A DELAWARE TRUST, WILMINGTO VS JORGE A. GONZALEZ ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/31/2023 AJX MORTGAGE TRUST I, A DELAWARE TRUST, WILMINGTO filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against JORGE A GONZALEZ. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    05/31/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AJX MORTGAGE TRUST I, A DELAWARE TRUST, WILMINGTO

Defendants

GONZALEZ, JORGE A.

2005 RESIDENTIAL TRUST 3-1

MIAMI-DADE COUNTY

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC Assignee of

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC.

CIRAS, LLC.

DAB PREMIUM FINANCE

FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY, LLC

DISCOVER BANK

CALVARY SPV I, LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF

GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

SURF CONSULTANTS II, INC.

GREAT SENECA FINANCIAL CORP., A MARYLAND CORPORATI

HART PROPERTIES I, LTD., A FLORIDA LIMITED PARTNER

SURF CONSULTANTS, INC., AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST

STATE OF FLORIDA, DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE,

CITY OF HIALEAH

8 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ryan B Lamchick (esq)

Defendant Attorney

Sprechman, Steven B

 

Court Documents

Answer

06/19/2023 - Answer

ESummons 20 Day Issued

06/09/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

06/09/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

06/09/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

06/09/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

06/09/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

06/09/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

06/09/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

06/09/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

06/09/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

06/09/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

06/09/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

06/09/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

06/09/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

06/09/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

06/09/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

06/09/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

06/09/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

37 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 9. Parties: CIRAS LLC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 24. Parties: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILEINSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 27.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 28. Parties: CALVARY SPV I LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 25. Parties: SURF CONSULTANTS INC. AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
51 More Docket Entries
  • 06/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3060169AMT PAID:$957.50NAME:RYAN B LAMCHICK (ESQ)LAMCHICK LAW GROUP PA 6910 N. KENDALL DRIVE FIRSTPINECREST FL 33156-2944COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3201-FORECLOSURE FILING1$906.00$906.003102-MULTIPLE DEFENDANT1$42.50$42.503142-RECORDING FEE1$4.00$4.003142-RECORDING FEE1$5.00$5.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$957.50RECEIPT DATE:06/02/2023REGISTER#:306CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Lis Pendens; Book/Page: 33733:4702; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less