This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 11/16/2023 at 14:08:33 (UTC).

MERCHANT CAPITAL GROUP LLC VS RONALD MCMAHON

Case Summary

On 07/07/2023 MERCHANT CAPITAL GROUP LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against RONALD MCMAHON. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MERCHANT CAPITAL GROUP LLC

GREENBOX CAPITAL

Defendants

MCMAHON, RONALD

MODERN HOMES RENOVATION AND AS GUARANTOR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Fisher, Stacey S

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

07/07/2023 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

07/07/2023 - Complaint

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

07/07/2023 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

07/17/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Service Returned

07/31/2023 - Service Returned

Service Returned

08/02/2023 - Service Returned

Motion for Default

08/16/2023 - Motion for Default

Notice of Filing:

08/16/2023 - Notice of Filing:

Non-Military Affidavit

08/16/2023 - Non-Military Affidavit

Order Setting CM Deadline

09/03/2023 - Order Setting CM Deadline

Notice of Hearing-

09/18/2023 - Notice of Hearing-

Order on Case Management Plan

10/03/2023 - Order on Case Management Plan

Case Management Report

10/03/2023 - Case Management Report

Order Setting Non-Jury Trial with Mediation Referral

10/03/2023 - Order Setting Non-Jury Trial with Mediation Referral

Notice of Hearing-

11/05/2023 - Notice of Hearing-

Order of Default

11/14/2023 - Order of Default

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

05/24/2024

HearingHearing Info; Description: Calendar Call; Hearing Code: CALND; Hearing Time: 8:00AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/24/2024

DocketDocket Entry: Calendar Call; Event Type: Hearing

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/14/2023

HearingHearing Info; Description: Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: MOTCAL; Hearing Time: 7:30AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/14/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Order of Default; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: MCMAHON RONALD

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/14/2023

DocketDocket Entry: Motion Calendar; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT AND FOR ATTORNEYS FEES DIN 10 156157

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/05/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Hearing-; Event Type: Event; Comments: 11/14/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/03/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Order Setting Non-Jury Trial with Mediation Referral; Event Type: Event; Comments: 06-03-2024

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/03/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Case Management Report; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/03/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Order on Case Management Plan; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Hearing-; Event Type: Event; Comments: 11/14/2023 AT 7:30AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
08/16/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Default; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/02/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/31/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/17/2023

DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/17/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 5. Parties: MCMAHON RONALD

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/13/2023

DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3160086AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:FISHER, STACEY S2775 NE 163RD ST STE 100NORTH MIAMI BEACH FL 33160-407COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:07/13/2023REGISTER#:316CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/08/2023

DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3130226AMT PAID:$401.00NAME:FISHER, STACEY S2775 NE 163RD ST STE 100NORTH MIAMI BEACH FL 33160-407COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$401.00RECEIPT DATE:07/08/2023REGISTER#:313CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/07/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/07/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/07/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less