This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 11/28/2023 at 21:37:27 (UTC).

MERCHANT CAPITAL GROUP LLC VS GILBERT F VASQUEZ

Case Summary

On 05/18/2023 MERCHANT CAPITAL GROUP LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against GILBERT F VASQUEZ. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Areces, Barbara. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    05/18/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

Judge Details

Not Yet Classified

Areces, Barbara

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MERCHANT CAPITAL GROUP LLC

CAPITAL , GREENBOX

Defendants

VASQUEZ, GILBERT F

FIRE HAWK PROTECTION AND AS GUARANTOR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Fisher, Stacey S

 

Court Documents

Non-Military Affidavit

08/04/2023 - Non-Military Affidavit

Motion for Default Judgment

08/04/2023 - Motion for Default Judgment

Complaint

05/18/2023 - Complaint

Affidavit as to Costs

11/23/2023 - Affidavit as to Costs

Affidavit of Proof(claim)

11/23/2023 - Affidavit of Proof(claim)

Affidavit as to Attorney Fees

11/23/2023 - Affidavit as to Attorney Fees

Affidavit as to Interest

11/23/2023 - Affidavit as to Interest

Final Disposition Document

11/23/2023 - Final Disposition Document

Motion for Sanctions

11/16/2023 - Motion for Sanctions

Order of Default

11/16/2023 - Order of Default

Memorandum of Disposition

11/16/2023 - Memorandum of Disposition

Amended Notice of Hearing

10/29/2023 - Amended Notice of Hearing

Order Granting Motion to Compel

10/25/2023 - Order Granting Motion to Compel

Motion to Compel

10/04/2023 - Motion to Compel

Notice of Hearing-

09/01/2023 - Notice of Hearing-

Notice of Interrogatory

08/28/2023 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Admissions

08/28/2023 - Request for Admissions

Request for Production

08/28/2023 - Request for Production

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

11/23/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Affidavit as to Costs; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/23/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Affidavit of Proof(claim); Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/23/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Affidavit as to Attorney Fees; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/23/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Affidavit as to Interest; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/23/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Final Disposition Document; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/16/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Sanctions; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/16/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Order of Default; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: VASQUEZ GILBERT F

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/16/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Memorandum of Disposition; Event Type: Event; Comments: HEARING ON 11/15/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/15/2023

HearingHearing Info; Description: Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: MOTCAL; Hearing Time: 9:00AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/15/2023

DocketDocket Entry: Motion Calendar; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT AND FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES 155633

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11 More Docket Entries
08/04/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Filing:; Event Type: Event; Comments: AFFIDAVIT OF PROOF

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/04/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Default Judgment; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/27/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/25/2023

DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 5. Parties: VASQUEZ GILBERT F

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/24/2023

DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3150263AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:FISHER, STACEY S2775 NE 163RD ST STE 100NORTH MIAMI BEACH FL 33160-407COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:05/24/2023REGISTER#:315CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/22/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/19/2023

DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3140164AMT PAID:$401.00NAME:FISHER, STACEY S2775 NE 163RD ST STE 100NORTH MIAMI BEACH FL 33160-407COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$401.00RECEIPT DATE:05/19/2023REGISTER#:314CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/18/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/18/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less