This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 08/06/2023 at 09:00:14 (UTC).

KAREN THIEME VS AMERICAN FURNITURE RENTALS, INC. ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/20/2023 KAREN THIEME filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against AMERICAN FURNITURE RENTALS, INC. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    03/20/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THIEME, KAREN

Defendants

AMERICAN FURNITURE RENTALS, INC.

SOUTH FLORIDA MOTORSPORTS, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gilbert, Harris W.

Defendant Attorneys

Jessica Rei King

Ronald F Negin

Busby, J S Scott

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

03/20/2023 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

03/20/2023 - Complaint

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

06/15/2023 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

06/15/2023 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

Notice:

06/20/2023 - Notice:

Notice:

06/20/2023 - Notice:

Notice of Interrogatory

06/20/2023 - Notice of Interrogatory

Notice of Interrogatory

06/20/2023 - Notice of Interrogatory

ESummons 20 Day Issued

06/28/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

06/28/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Notice of Appearance

07/06/2023 - Notice of Appearance

Notice:

07/06/2023 - Notice:

Stipulation

07/06/2023 - Stipulation

AgreedOrder

07/07/2023 - AgreedOrder

Service Returned

07/10/2023 - Service Returned

Notice of Appearance

07/14/2023 - Notice of Appearance

Answer

07/26/2023 - Answer

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: AMERICAN FURNITURE RENTALS INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: AgreedOrder; Event Type: Event; Comments: GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Stipulation; Event Type: Event; Comments: FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Ronald F Negin; Busby J S Scott; SOUTH FLORIDA MOTORSPORTS LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 10. Parties: SOUTH FLORIDA MOTORSPORTS LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 06/24/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3170049AMT PAID:$20.00NAME:GILBERT, HARRIS W.3475 SHERIDAN ST STE 301HOLLYWOOD FL 33021-3660COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.003139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$20.00RECEIPT DATE:06/24/2023REGISTER#:317CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3120173AMT PAID:$401.00NAME:GILBERT, HARRIS W.3475 SHERIDAN ST STE 301HOLLYWOOD FL 33021-3660COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$401.00RECEIPT DATE:03/25/2023REGISTER#:312CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less