This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 09/11/2023 at 15:51:05 (UTC).

MERCHANT CAPITAL GROUP LLC VS GENPEX LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/10/2023 MERCHANT CAPITAL GROUP LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against GENPEX LLC. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    05/10/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MERCHANT CAPITAL GROUP LLC

GREENBOX CAPITAL

Defendants

GENPEX LLC

MOBURG AS GUARANTOR, JAMES

BATH WIZARD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Fisher, Stacey S

 

Court Documents

Motion for Default

08/23/2023 - Motion for Default

Non-Military Affidavit

08/23/2023 - Non-Military Affidavit

Order Setting CM Deadline

08/22/2023 - Order Setting CM Deadline

Motion for Default

06/30/2023 - Motion for Default

Complaint

05/10/2023 - Complaint

Notice of Interrogatory

08/28/2023 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Admissions

08/28/2023 - Request for Admissions

Request:

08/28/2023 - Request:

Service Returned

08/28/2023 - Service Returned

Notice of Filing:

08/23/2023 - Notice of Filing:

Notice of Filing:

08/23/2023 - Notice of Filing:

Notice of Hearing-

08/20/2023 - Notice of Hearing-

Notice of Filing:

06/30/2023 - Notice of Filing:

ESummons 20 Day (M) Issued

06/28/2023 - ESummons 20 Day (M) Issued

Service Returned

06/12/2023 - Service Returned

ESummons 20 Day Issued

05/18/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

05/12/2023 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

05/12/2023 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/01/2023
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: MOTCAL; Hearing Time: 9:00AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion Calendar; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT AND FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES 155501

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request:; Event Type: Event; Comments: TO PRODUCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Non-Military Affidavit; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Filing:; Event Type: Event; Comments: AFFIDAVIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Filing:; Event Type: Event; Comments: AFFIDAVIT OF PROOF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Default; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 06/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day (M) Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 6. Parties: MOBURG AS GUARANTOR JAMES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 5. Parties: GENPEX LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3180121AMT PAID:$20.00NAME:FISHER, STACEY S2775 NE 163RD ST STE 100NORTH MIAMI BEACH FL 33160-407COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.003139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$20.00RECEIPT DATE:05/18/2023REGISTER#:318CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3090046AMT PAID:$401.00NAME:FISHER, STACEY S2775 NE 163RD ST STE 100NORTH MIAMI BEACH FL 33160-407COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$401.00RECEIPT DATE:05/11/2023REGISTER#:309CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less