This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 05/26/2023 at 04:38:03 (UTC).

MANUEL V. FEIJOO, M.D., P.A. VS OCEAN HARBOR CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 04/04/2023 MANUEL filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against FEIJOO, M D , P A. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Coral Gables District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-25

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Manuel V. Feijoo, M.D., P.A.

Assignor

Gonzalez, Yadier

Defendant

Ocean Harbor Casualty Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David, George A

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

04/04/2023 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Statement of Claim

04/04/2023 - Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim

04/04/2023 - Statement of Claim

Notice of Interrogatory

04/04/2023 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Admissions

04/04/2023 - Request for Admissions

Request for Production

04/04/2023 - Request for Production

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

04/06/2023 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

04/13/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Voluntary Dismissal

04/21/2023 - Voluntary Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/21/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Book/Page: 33676:1832; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 8. Parties: Ocean Harbor Casualty Insurance Company

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3090295AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:DAVID, GEORGE A500 S. DIXIE HWY #220CORAL GABLES FL 33146COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:04/11/2023REGISTER#:309CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3170491AMT PAID:$175.00NAME:DAVID, GEORGE A500 S. DIXIE HWY #220CORAL GABLES FL 33146COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$175.00$175.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$175.00RECEIPT DATE:04/06/2023REGISTER#:317CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event; Comments: 500.01

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less