This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 11/15/2023 at 09:20:19 (UTC).

PEDRO J. GARCIA, AS PROPERTY APPRAISER OF MIAMI VS WAL-MART STORES EAST, LP ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/26/2023 PEDRO J GARCIA, AS PROPERTY APPRAISER OF MIAMI filed an Other - Writ Of Mandamus lawsuit against WAL-MART STORES EAST, LP. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Writ Of Mandamus

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PEDRO J. GARCIA, as Property Appraiser of Miami

Defendants

WAL-MART STORES EAST, LP

JIM ZINGALE, as Executive Director of the State

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Bonzon-Keenan, Geraldine Teresa

Defendant Attorneys

Tew, Spencer A

Thomas L Barnhart

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

07/26/2023 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

07/26/2023 - Complaint

Request for Production

07/26/2023 - Request for Production

Notice of Interrogatory

07/26/2023 - Notice of Interrogatory

Lis Pendens

07/26/2023 - Lis Pendens

Notice:

09/06/2023 - Notice:

Notice of Appearance

09/13/2023 - Notice of Appearance

Notice:

09/15/2023 - Notice:

Order Setting CM Deadline

09/25/2023 - Order Setting CM Deadline

Answer and Affirmative Defense

09/29/2023 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

Answer

10/11/2023 - Answer

Notice of Unavailability/absence

11/02/2023 - Notice of Unavailability/absence

 

Docket Entries

11/02/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Unavailability/absence; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/11/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Answer; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: JIM ZINGALE as Executive Director of the State

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/29/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Answer and Affirmative Defense; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: WAL-MART STORES EAST LP

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Order Setting CM Deadline; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: ACCEPTA NCE OF SERVICE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Thomas L Barnhart; JIM ZINGALE as Executive Director of the State

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/06/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/27/2023

DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3090164AMT PAID:$410.00NAME:BONZON-KEENAN, GERALDINE TERESA111 NW 1ST ST STE 2800MIAMI FL 33128-1930COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.003142-RECORDING FEE1$4.00$4.003142-RECORDING FEE1$5.00$5.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$410.00RECEIPT DATE:07/27/2023REGISTER#:309CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/26/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Lis Pendens; Book/Page: 33819:2815; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/26/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/26/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/26/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/26/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less