This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 09/10/2023 at 11:00:19 (UTC).

UNLIMITED DIAGNOSTIC CENTER INC VS LYNDON SOUTHERN INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 05/18/2023 UNLIMITED DIAGNOSTIC CENTER INC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against LYNDON SOUTHERN INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Hialeah District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-21

  • Filing Date:

    05/18/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UNLIMITED DIAGNOSTIC CENTER INC

Assignor

Everson, Tondra

Defendant

LYNDON SOUTHERN INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Abraham S. Ovadia, Esq.

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

05/18/2023 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Statement of Claim

05/18/2023 - Statement of Claim

Notice of Interrogatory

05/18/2023 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Production

05/18/2023 - Request for Production

Request for Admissions

05/18/2023 - Request for Admissions

Email Notice:

05/18/2023 - Email Notice:

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

05/22/2023 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

05/31/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

06/05/2023 - Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

Voluntary Dismissal

08/05/2023 - Voluntary Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/05/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Book/Page: 33828:4032; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 8. Parties: LYNDON SOUTHERN INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3200175AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:ABRAHAM S. OVADIA, ESQ.4800 N FEDERAL HWY STE 204DBOCA RATON FL 33431-3413COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:05/23/2023REGISTER#:320CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3210092AMT PAID:$55.00NAME:ABRAHAM S. OVADIA, ESQ.4800 N FEDERAL HWY STE 204DBOCA RATON FL 33431-3413COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$55.00$55.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$55.00RECEIPT DATE:05/20/2023REGISTER#:321CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Email Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: EMAIL ADDRESS:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less