This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 09/15/2023 at 04:00:20 (UTC).

ROSE RADIOLOGY CENTERS, LLC. VS UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION

Case Summary

On 05/26/2023 ROSE RADIOLOGY CENTERS, LLC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Joseph Caleb Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-20

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Rose Radiology Centers, Llc.

Group, Advanced Diagnostic

Assignor

Palomo, Marcelo

Defendant

United Services Automobile Association

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Estevez, Marisol

Defendant Attorneys

Abreu, Natalie M, ESQ

Arielle S Petyan

 

Court Documents

Motion to Dismiss

07/10/2023 - Motion to Dismiss

Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

06/12/2023 - Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

AgreedOrder

09/14/2023 - AgreedOrder

Notice of Cancellation of Hearing

09/14/2023 - Notice of Cancellation of Hearing

Pretrial Catalog

09/08/2023 - Pretrial Catalog

Notice of Interrogatory

09/06/2023 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Production

09/06/2023 - Request for Production

Notice of Appearance

08/30/2023 - Notice of Appearance

Motion for Extension of Time

08/16/2023 - Motion for Extension of Time

Notice of Hearing-

07/18/2023 - Notice of Hearing-

Notice of Hearing-

07/18/2023 - Notice of Hearing-

Notice of Appearance

07/10/2023 - Notice of Appearance

Notice of Service of Process

06/19/2023 - Notice of Service of Process

ESummons 20 Day Issued

06/06/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

06/05/2023 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

Notice of Appearance

05/26/2023 - Notice of Appearance

Request for Admissions

05/26/2023 - Request for Admissions

Notice of Interrogatory

05/26/2023 - Notice of Interrogatory

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: AgreedOrder; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Cancellation of Hearing; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Pretrial Catalog; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Hearing-; Event Type: Event; Comments: SEPTEMBER 15, 2023 @ 9:45AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Hearing-; Event Type: Event; Comments: 9-15-2023 AT 9:45 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Dismiss; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: United Services Automobile Association

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 06/06/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 8. Parties: United Services Automobile Association

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3180189AMT PAID:$55.00NAME:ESTEVEZ, MARISOL4770 BISCAYNE BLVD STE 1030MIAMI FL 33137-3232COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$55.00$55.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$55.00RECEIPT DATE:06/01/2023REGISTER#:318CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less