This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 05/17/2023 at 14:56:23 (UTC).

WEST ORANGE WELLNESS & INJURY CENTER VS GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 03/27/2023 WEST ORANGE WELLNESS INJURY CENTER filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami Beach District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-24

  • Filing Date:

    03/27/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

West Orange Wellness & Injury Center

Assignor

Forster, Charles

Defendant

Geico General Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Patino, Richard

 

Court Documents

Notice of Appearance

05/15/2023 - Notice of Appearance

Notice of Service of Process

05/11/2023 - Notice of Service of Process

Motion:

05/11/2023 - Motion:

Notice:

05/11/2023 - Notice:

Notice:

05/11/2023 - Notice:

Motion:

05/11/2023 - Motion:

Request for Admissions

05/11/2023 - Request for Admissions

Request for Production

05/11/2023 - Request for Production

Notice of Interrogatory

05/11/2023 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request:

05/11/2023 - Request:

Notice of Interrogatory

05/11/2023 - Notice of Interrogatory

Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

05/01/2023 - Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

ESummons 20 Day Issued

04/24/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

04/21/2023 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

Email Notice:

03/27/2023 - Email Notice:

Notice of Interrogatory

03/27/2023 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Production

03/27/2023 - Request for Production

Request for Admissions

03/27/2023 - Request for Admissions

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Service of Process; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Geico General Insurance Company

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion:; Event Type: Event; Comments: PLAINTIFF MOTION TO VACATE ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: AFFIDAVIT OF EXCUSABLE NEGLECT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: AFFIDAVIT OF EXCUSABLE NEGLECT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion:; Event Type: Event; Comments: TO VACATE COURT ORDER DATED OCTOBER 31, 2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request:; Event Type: Event; Comments: TO PRODUCE REGARDING DEMAND LETTER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 04/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 8. Parties: Geico General Insurance Company

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3070235AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:PATINO, RICHARDPATINO LAW FIRM P.O. BOX 133877HIALEAH FL 33013COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:04/22/2023REGISTER#:307CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3250265AMT PAID:$80.00NAME:PATINO, RICHARDPATINO LAW FIRM P.O. BOX 133877HIALEAH FL 33013COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$80.00$80.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$80.00RECEIPT DATE:03/29/2023REGISTER#:325CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Email Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: EMAIL ADDRESS:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less