This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 06/08/2023 at 09:40:39 (UTC).

ALL X RAY DIAGNOSTIC SERVICES CORP VS INFINITY INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 05/24/2023 ALL X RAY DIAGNOSTIC SERVICES CORP filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against INFINITY INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, South Dade Justice Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-26

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

All X Ray Diagnostic Services Corp

Defendant

Infinity Indemnity Insurance Company

Assignee

Dayana, Castellanos

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Cavada, Derek L, ESQ

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

05/24/2023 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Statement of Claim

05/24/2023 - Statement of Claim

Email Notice:

05/24/2023 - Email Notice:

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

06/01/2023 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

06/06/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/06/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 4. Parties: Infinity Indemnity Insurance Company

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3020169AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:CAVADA, DEREK L, ESQTHE CAVADA LAW FIRM, P.A. 7925 NW 12TH ST. SUITE 3DORAL FL 33126COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:06/02/2023REGISTER#:302CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3020033AMT PAID:$175.00NAME:CAVADA, DEREK L, ESQTHE CAVADA LAW FIRM, P.A. 7925 NW 12TH ST. SUITE 3DORAL FL 33126COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$175.00$175.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$175.00RECEIPT DATE:06/02/2023REGISTER#:302CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Email Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: EMAIL ADDRESS:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less