This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 06/26/2023 at 16:43:58 (UTC).

TELEEMC LLC VS UNITED AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 03/21/2023 TELEEMC LLC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against UNITED AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, South Dade Justice Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-26

  • Filing Date:

    03/21/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TELEEMC LLC

Defendant

UNITED AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Assignee

PEGUERO, EDUARDO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Carla C. Martinez

Defendant Attorney

White, Camille A.

 

Court Documents

Voluntary Dismissal

06/14/2023 - Voluntary Dismissal

Voluntary Dismissal

06/09/2023 - Voluntary Dismissal

Order Extending Time for

05/28/2023 - Order Extending Time for

Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

05/08/2023 - Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

Motion for Attorneys Fees

05/01/2023 - Motion for Attorneys Fees

Notice of Filing:

04/28/2023 - Notice of Filing:

Motion for Extension of Time

04/21/2023 - Motion for Extension of Time

Notice of Service of Process

04/06/2023 - Notice of Service of Process

ESummons 20 Day Issued

03/29/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

03/27/2023 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

Notice of Appearance

03/21/2023 - Notice of Appearance

Notice of Interrogatory

03/21/2023 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Admissions

03/21/2023 - Request for Admissions

Request for Production

03/21/2023 - Request for Production

Statement of Claim

03/21/2023 - Statement of Claim

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

03/21/2023 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Book/Page: 33764:808; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Book/Page: 33761:4923; Event Type: Event; Comments: WITH PREJUDICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order Extending Time for; Event Type: Event; Comments: RESPONSE TO COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Attorneys Fees; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Filing:; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Service of Process; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3100167AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:CARLA C. MARTINEZ2601 SOUTH BAYSHORE DRIVE 18TH FLOORCOCONUT GOVE FL 33133COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:03/30/2023REGISTER#:310CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 8. Parties: UNITED AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3102066AMT PAID:$80.00NAME:CARLA C. MARTINEZ2601 SOUTH BAYSHORE DRIVE 18TH FLOORCOCONUT GOVE FL 33133COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$80.00$80.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$80.00RECEIPT DATE:03/28/2023REGISTER#:310CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less