This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 05/26/2023 at 13:24:07 (UTC).

PRESGAR IMAGING OF CMI NORTH, LC VS PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 03/21/2023 PRESGAR IMAGING OF CMI NORTH, LC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, South Dade Justice Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-26

  • Filing Date:

    03/21/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PRESGAR IMAGING OF CMI NORTH, LC

Assignor

TONOS DE SOTO, MARIA ESPERANZA

Defendant

PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Myones, Howard

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

03/21/2023 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Statement of Claim

03/21/2023 - Statement of Claim

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

05/15/2023 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

05/22/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

05/23/2023 - Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 4. Parties: PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3220187AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:MYONES, HOWARD1005 W STATE ROAD 84 SUITE 514FORT LAUDERDALE FL 33315COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:05/20/2023REGISTER#:322CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3072132AMT PAID:$55.00NAME:MYONES, HOWARD1005 W STATE ROAD 84 SUITE 514FORT LAUDERDALE FL 33315COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$55.00$55.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$55.00RECEIPT DATE:03/25/2023REGISTER#:307CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less