This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 08/31/2023 at 05:56:49 (UTC).

STONE STREET ORIGINATIONS LLC VS METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/31/2023 STONE STREET ORIGINATIONS LLC filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    05/31/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Stone Street Originations LLC

Defendants

Metropolitan Life Insurance Company

Metropolitan Tower Life Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Petitt, Richard Thomas

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

05/31/2023 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

05/31/2023 - Complaint

Amended Complaint

06/08/2023 - Amended Complaint

Notice of Filing:

06/13/2023 - Notice of Filing:

Notice of Hearing-

06/15/2023 - Notice of Hearing-

Amended Complaint

07/03/2023 - Amended Complaint

Amended Notice of Hearing

07/03/2023 - Amended Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing-

07/05/2023 - Notice of Hearing-

Notice of Hearing-

07/26/2023 - Notice of Hearing-

Notice of Hearing-

08/15/2023 - Notice of Hearing-

Final Order by Judge

08/29/2023 - Final Order by Judge

Order:

08/29/2023 - Order:

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/29/2023
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: MOTCAL; Hearing Time: 9:40AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order:; Event Type: Event; Comments: SEALING UNREDACTED FINAL ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Final Order by Judge; Event Type: Event; Comments: GRANTING APPROVAL FOR TRANSFER OF STRUCTURED SETTLEMENT PAYMENT RIGHTS Parties: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company; Metropolitan Tower Life Insurance Company

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Final Order by Judge; Event Type: Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion Calendar; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: APPLICATION FOR COURT APPROVAL OF A TRANSFER OF STRUCTURED SETTLEMENT PAYMENT RIGHTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Hearing-; Event Type: Event; Comments: AUGUST 29, 2023 @ 9:40 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2023
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: MOTCAL; Hearing Time: 10:05AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Hearing-; Event Type: Event; Comments: AUGUST 15,2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion Calendar; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: AMENDED APPLICATION FOR COURT APPROVAL OF A TRANSFER OF STRUCTURED SETTLEMENT PAYMENT RIGHTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Hearing-; Event Type: Event; Comments: JULY 26, 2023 @ 10:05 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Amended Notice of Hearing; Event Type: Event; Comments: JULY 5, 2023, AT 10:20 A.M.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Amended Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Hearing-; Event Type: Event; Comments: JULY 5, 2023, AT 10:20 A.M

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Filing:; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Amended Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3060179AMT PAID:$401.00NAME:PETITT, RICHARD THOMAS4830 W KENNEDY BLVD STE 475TAMPA FL 33609-2599COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$401.00RECEIPT DATE:06/02/2023REGISTER#:306CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less