This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 07/14/2023 at 03:35:55 (UTC).

SIGNATURE SHIELD INC VS GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 04/17/2023 SIGNATURE SHIELD INC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, South Dade Justice Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-26

  • Filing Date:

    04/17/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Signature Shield Inc

Assignor

Farrell, Tina

Defendant

Geico General Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Emilio R Stillo

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

04/17/2023 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Statement of Claim

04/17/2023 - Statement of Claim

Request for Admissions

04/17/2023 - Request for Admissions

Request for Production

04/17/2023 - Request for Production

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

04/18/2023 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

04/25/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

05/16/2023 - Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

Notice of Service of Process

06/20/2023 - Notice of Service of Process

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Service of Process; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 6. Parties: Geico General Insurance Company

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3120271AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:EMILIO R STILLO7320 GRIFFIN RD STE 203DAVIE FL 33314-4105COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:04/21/2023REGISTER#:312CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3150464AMT PAID:$175.00NAME:EMILIO R STILLO7320 GRIFFIN RD STE 203DAVIE FL 33314-4105COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$175.00$175.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$175.00RECEIPT DATE:04/19/2023REGISTER#:315CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event; Comments: $2500.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less