This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 09/21/2023 at 12:12:32 (UTC).

PRESGAR IMAGING OF CMI SOUTH, L.C. VS UNITED AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 05/30/2023 PRESGAR IMAGING OF CMI SOUTH, L C filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against UNITED AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Coral Gables District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-25

  • Filing Date:

    05/30/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PRESGAR IMAGING OF CMI SOUTH, L.C.

Assignor

Murray, Tawana

Defendant

UNITED AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gregory E Gudin

Defendant Attorney

Zamora, Sandra

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

05/30/2023 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Statement of Claim

05/30/2023 - Statement of Claim

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

07/07/2023 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

07/18/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

07/24/2023 - Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

Motion for Extension of Time

08/25/2023 - Motion for Extension of Time

Request for Admissions

08/28/2023 - Request for Admissions

Request for Production

08/28/2023 - Request for Production

Notice of Interrogatory

08/28/2023 - Notice of Interrogatory

Email Notice:

08/28/2023 - Email Notice:

Request for Admissions

08/28/2023 - Request for Admissions

Request for Production

08/28/2023 - Request for Production

Notice of Interrogatory

08/28/2023 - Notice of Interrogatory

Notice of Service of Process

09/06/2023 - Notice of Service of Process

Voluntary Dismissal

09/14/2023 - Voluntary Dismissal

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

09/14/2023

DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Book/Page: 33887:2864; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/06/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Service of Process; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: UNITED AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/28/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/28/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/28/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/28/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Email Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: EMAIL ADDRESS:

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/28/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/28/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/28/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/24/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/18/2023

DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/18/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 4. Parties: UNITED AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/14/2023

DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3090089AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:GREGORY E GUDINLANDAU & ASSOCIATES PA 1619 NW 136TH AVE SUITE 2CSUNRISE FL 33323COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:07/14/2023REGISTER#:309CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/07/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/03/2023

DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3100355AMT PAID:$80.00NAME:GREGORY E GUDINLANDAU & ASSOCIATES PA 1619 NW 136TH AVE SUITE 2CSUNRISE FL 33323COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$80.00$80.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$80.00RECEIPT DATE:06/03/2023REGISTER#:310CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/30/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/30/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less