This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 11/17/2023 at 18:15:30 (UTC).

RICHARD KNEZ ET AL VS HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC. (THE( ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/15/2023 RICHARD KNEZ filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against HOME DEPOT U S A , INC THE. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

KNEZ, RICHARD

KNEZ, JENNIFER

Defendants

HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC. (THE(

COREWOOD LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Neumann, Erich B.

Defendant Attorneys

Brooks, Jennifer Miller

Archila, Kimberly P.

Caldwell, Joni A., ESQ

Daniel J Santaniello

 

Court Documents

Answer and Demand for Jury Trial

11/05/2023 - Answer and Demand for Jury Trial

Notice of Appearance

10/19/2023 - Notice of Appearance

Answer and Affirmative Defense

10/13/2023 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

Request for Production

10/09/2023 - Request for Production

Notice of Interrogatory

10/09/2023 - Notice of Interrogatory

Notice of Production

10/09/2023 - Notice of Production

Notice of Appearance

10/09/2023 - Notice of Appearance

Service Returned

09/28/2023 - Service Returned

Service Returned

09/28/2023 - Service Returned

ESummons 20 Day Issued

09/18/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

09/18/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

09/16/2023 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

09/16/2023 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

Request for Admissions

09/15/2023 - Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

09/15/2023 - Request for Admissions

Request for Production

09/15/2023 - Request for Production

Request for Production

09/15/2023 - Request for Production

Notice of Interrogatory

09/15/2023 - Notice of Interrogatory

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

11/05/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Answer and Demand for Jury Trial; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: COREWOOD LLC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/19/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Daniel J Santaniello; COREWOOD LLC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/13/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Answer and Affirmative Defense; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: HOME DEPOT U.S.A. INC. (THE(

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/09/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/09/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/09/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Production; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/09/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Brooks Jennifer Miller; HOME DEPOT U.S.A. INC. (THE(

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event; Comments: SUMMONS W/O RETURN OF SERVICE ATTACHED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/19/2023

DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3190063AMT PAID:$20.00NAME:NEUMANN, ERICH B.3174 VIRGINIA STREETMIAMI FL 33133COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.003139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$20.00RECEIPT DATE:09/19/2023REGISTER#:319CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
09/16/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/16/2023

DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3120086AMT PAID:$401.00NAME:NEUMANN, ERICH B.3174 VIRGINIA STREETMIAMI FL 33133COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$401.00RECEIPT DATE:09/16/2023REGISTER#:312CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less