This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 06/11/2023 at 03:40:00 (UTC).

CITIMORTGAGE INC VS SEAN MCGINNIS SPECIAL ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/23/2023 CITIMORTGAGE INC filed an Other lawsuit against SEAN MCGINNIS SPECIAL. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    05/23/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Citimortgage Inc

Defendants

Sean Mcginnis Special

The Casper Trust under Agreement Dated April

Mcginnis, Sean

Winterfeldt, Brian J

Sunset Harbour South Condominium Association Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Melissa E Konick

 

Court Documents

Complaint

05/23/2023 - Complaint

ESummons 20 Day Issued

06/02/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

06/02/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

06/02/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

06/02/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

06/02/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

06/02/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

05/26/2023 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

05/26/2023 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

05/26/2023 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

05/26/2023 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

05/26/2023 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

05/26/2023 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

Lis Pendens

05/24/2023 - Lis Pendens

Notice:

05/23/2023 - Notice:

Verification Form for Mortgage Foreclosure

05/23/2023 - Verification Form for Mortgage Foreclosure

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

05/23/2023 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/02/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 9. Parties: Winterfeldt Brian J

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 13.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 14.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 10. Parties: Sean Mcginnis Special

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 11. Parties: Mcginnis Sean

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 12. Parties: Sunset Harbour South Condominium Association Inc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 05/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3100066AMT PAID:$1,915.00NAME:MELISSA E KONICK6409 CONGRESS AVE STE 100BOCA RATON FL 33487-2853COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3201-FORECLOSURE FILING1$1,906.00$1,906.003142-RECORDING FEE1$4.00$4.003142-RECORDING FEE1$5.00$5.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$1,915.00RECEIPT DATE:05/25/2023REGISTER#:310CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Lis Pendens; Book/Page: 33722:2474; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: CERTIFICATION OF POSSESSION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Verification Form for Mortgage Foreclosure; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less