This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 09/13/2023 at 09:39:22 (UTC).

A&Y REHABILITATION MEDICAL CENTER, INC. VS UNITED AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 03/09/2023 A Y REHABILITATION MEDICAL CENTER, INC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against UNITED AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami Beach District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-24

  • Filing Date:

    03/09/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

A&Y Rehabilitation Medical Center, Inc.

Assignor

Andino, Wilson

Defendant

United Automobile Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Patino, Richard

Defendant Attorney

Jerome, Monique A.

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

03/09/2023 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Email Notice:

03/09/2023 - Email Notice:

Notice:

03/09/2023 - Notice:

Request for Admissions

03/09/2023 - Request for Admissions

Notice of Interrogatory

03/09/2023 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Production

03/09/2023 - Request for Production

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

03/27/2023 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

03/28/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

04/25/2023 - Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

Answer and Affirmative Defense

05/05/2023 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

Motion for Extension of Time

05/08/2023 - Motion for Extension of Time

Motion for Extension of Time

05/10/2023 - Motion for Extension of Time

Reply to Affirmative Defenses

07/24/2023 - Reply to Affirmative Defenses

Notice of Service of Process

08/15/2023 - Notice of Service of Process

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Service of Process; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: United Automobile Insurance Company

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Reply to Affirmative Defenses; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer and Affirmative Defense; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3250283AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:PATINO, RICHARDPATINO LAW FIRM P.O. BOX 133877HIALEAH FL 33013COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:03/29/2023REGISTER#:325CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 8. Parties: United Automobile Insurance Company

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3190016AMT PAID:$55.00NAME:PATINO, RICHARDPATINO LAW FIRM P.O. BOX 133877HIALEAH FL 33013COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$55.00$55.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$55.00RECEIPT DATE:03/10/2023REGISTER#:319CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH FLORIDA RULE OF JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION 2.516 AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Email Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: EMAIL ADDRESS:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less