This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 11/07/2023 at 05:12:45 (UTC).

PROS MIAMI ACCIDENT & INJURY CLINICS VS UNITED AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 05/09/2023 PROS MIAMI ACCIDENT INJURY CLINICS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against UNITED AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Hialeah District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-21

  • Filing Date:

    05/09/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PROS Miami Accident & Injury Clinics

Assignor

Andre, Anex

Defendant

United Automobile Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Patino, Richard

Defendant Attorney

Zamora, Sandra

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

05/09/2023 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Statement of Claim

05/09/2023 - Statement of Claim

Notice:

05/09/2023 - Notice:

Request for Admissions

05/09/2023 - Request for Admissions

Notice of Interrogatory

05/09/2023 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Production

05/09/2023 - Request for Production

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

06/09/2023 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

06/23/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

06/26/2023 - Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

Motion for Extension of Time

08/07/2023 - Motion for Extension of Time

Answer and Affirmative Defense

08/28/2023 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

Reply

09/28/2023 - Reply

 

Docket Entries

09/28/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Reply; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/28/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Answer and Affirmative Defense; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/07/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/26/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/23/2023

DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/23/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 8. Parties: United Automobile Insurance Company

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/16/2023

DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3080013AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:PATINO, RICHARDPATINO LAW FIRM P.O. BOX 133877HIALEAH FL 33013COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:06/16/2023REGISTER#:308CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/09/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/11/2023

DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3080079AMT PAID:$55.00NAME:PATINO, RICHARDPATINO LAW FIRM P.O. BOX 133877HIALEAH FL 33013COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$55.00$55.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$55.00RECEIPT DATE:05/11/2023REGISTER#:308CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/09/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/09/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/09/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/09/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/09/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/09/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less