This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 09/06/2023 at 16:41:59 (UTC).

WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY FSB NOT IN ITS IND VS REINA AGUILAR ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/25/2023 WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY FSB NOT IN ITS IND filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against REINA AGUILAR. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    05/25/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY FSB NOT IN ITS IND

CAPACITY BUT SOLELY AS OWNER TRUSTEE OF CIM 2022 R

Defendants

AGUILAR, REINA

PEREZ, OLGA AGUILAR

PEREZ, MARGOT AGUILAR

ALL DADE GENERAL CONSTRUCTION INC

CAPITAL ONE BANK NA

ASSET ACCEPTANCE LLC

MIAMI-DADE COUNTY FLORIDA CODE ENFORCEMENT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kiser, Amy Marie

 

Court Documents

Complaint

05/25/2023 - Complaint

Notice of Action - Publication

09/05/2023 - Notice of Action - Publication

Affidavit of Diligent Search

08/29/2023 - Affidavit of Diligent Search

Affidavit of Diligent Search

08/29/2023 - Affidavit of Diligent Search

Order Setting CM Deadline

08/22/2023 - Order Setting CM Deadline

Publication Rejection Letter

07/25/2023 - Publication Rejection Letter

Notice:

07/13/2023 - Notice:

Affidavit of Diligent Search

07/13/2023 - Affidavit of Diligent Search

Affidavit as to Attorney Fees

07/13/2023 - Affidavit as to Attorney Fees

Notice of Filing:

07/13/2023 - Notice of Filing:

Objection:

07/12/2023 - Objection:

Order Extending Time for

07/10/2023 - Order Extending Time for

Notice:

07/07/2023 - Notice:

Summons Returned - No Service

07/05/2023 - Summons Returned - No Service

Summons Returned - No Service

07/05/2023 - Summons Returned - No Service

Summons Returned - No Service

07/05/2023 - Summons Returned - No Service

Service Returned

07/05/2023 - Service Returned

Motion to Stay

06/27/2023 - Motion to Stay

42 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/05/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Action Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Action - Publication; Event Type: Event; Comments: AND TO THE UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF OLGA AGUILAR PEREZ.1-MAILOUT Parties: PEREZ OLGA AGUILAR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Affidavit of Diligent Search; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Affidavit of Diligent Search; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order Setting CM Deadline; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Publication Rejection Letter; Event Type: Event; Comments: -PER THE CLERK'S PROCEDURES UNABLE TO PROCESS, DUE TO MISSING COMPLAINT AND ENVELOPE FOR DEFENDANT OLGA PEREZ. BOTH THE NOTICE OF ACTION AND DILIGENT SEARCH ON THE UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF OLGA AGUILAR PEREZ DOES NOT MATCH.-MAILED BACK TO ATTORNEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Affidavit of Diligent Search; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Affidavit as to Attorney Fees; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Filing:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RETAINER AGREEMENT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
43 More Docket Entries
  • 05/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3030194AMT PAID:$932.50NAME:KISER, AMY MARIE2313 W VIOLET STTAMPA FL 33603-1423COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3201-FORECLOSURE FILING1$906.00$906.003102-MULTIPLE DEFENDANT1$17.50$17.503142-RECORDING FEE1$4.00$4.003142-RECORDING FEE1$5.00$5.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$932.50RECEIPT DATE:05/26/2023REGISTER#:303CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Lis Pendens; Book/Page: 33725:2820; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Verification Form for Mortgage Foreclosure; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Email Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: EMAILSERVICE@GILBERTGROUPLAW.COM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less