This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 09/10/2023 at 11:39:28 (UTC).

CITIMORTGAGE INC VS JESUS BETANCOURT ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/19/2023 CITIMORTGAGE INC filed an Other lawsuit against JESUS BETANCOURT. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CitiMortgage Inc

Defendants

Betancourt, Jesus

De Betancourt, Aracelis

Mint Condominium Association Inc

BETANCOURT, JESUS ENRIQUE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Molly Emma Carey

 

Court Documents

Complaint

05/19/2023 - Complaint

Summons Returned - No Service

09/05/2023 - Summons Returned - No Service

Summons Returned - No Service

09/01/2023 - Summons Returned - No Service

Summons Returned - No Service

09/01/2023 - Summons Returned - No Service

Summons Returned - No Service

09/01/2023 - Summons Returned - No Service

Service Returned

08/30/2023 - Service Returned

Certificate of Service

08/25/2023 - Certificate of Service

Order Setting CM Deadline

08/22/2023 - Order Setting CM Deadline

ESummons 20 Day Issued

05/24/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

05/24/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

05/24/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

05/24/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

05/24/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

05/22/2023 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

05/22/2023 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

05/22/2023 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

05/22/2023 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

05/22/2023 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Summons Returned - No Service; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Summons Returned - No Service; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Summons Returned - No Service; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Summons Returned - No Service; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Certificate of Service; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order Setting CM Deadline; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 13.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 14.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 05/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3200082AMT PAID:$915.00NAME:MOLLY EMMA CAREY6267 OLD WATER OAK ROAD, SUITE 203TALLAHASSEE FL 32312-3858COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3201-FORECLOSURE FILING1$906.00$906.003142-RECORDING FEE1$4.00$4.003142-RECORDING FEE1$5.00$5.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$915.00RECEIPT DATE:05/20/2023REGISTER#:320CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Lis Pendens; Book/Page: 33720:1694; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Certificate of Possession of Note; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Appraisal of Real Property; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less