This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 11/17/2023 at 12:59:29 (UTC).

NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC VS QUEEN WILLIAMS ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/04/2023 NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against QUEEN WILLIAMS. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC

Defendants

WILLIAMS, QUEEN

WILLIAMS, ZETA

PARK FINANCE OF BROWARD, INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Orlando De Luca

Defendant Attorney

Jeffrey, Douglas J.

 

Court Documents

Order Denying Motion to Dismiss

08/23/2023 - Order Denying Motion to Dismiss

Order Setting CM Deadline

08/22/2023 - Order Setting CM Deadline

Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

08/18/2023 - Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

Response to Motion

08/04/2023 - Response to Motion

Motion for Extension of Time

07/20/2023 - Motion for Extension of Time

Motion to Compel

07/19/2023 - Motion to Compel

Motion for Extension of Time

06/12/2023 - Motion for Extension of Time

Motion to Dismiss

06/23/2023 - Motion to Dismiss

Complaint

05/04/2023 - Complaint

Motion to Strike

11/14/2023 - Motion to Strike

Notice of Taking Video Deposition

11/03/2023 - Notice of Taking Video Deposition

Notice of Hearing-

11/01/2023 - Notice of Hearing-

Notice of Taking Deposition

11/01/2023 - Notice of Taking Deposition

Notice of Cancellation of Hearing

10/31/2023 - Notice of Cancellation of Hearing

Witness and Exhibit List

10/27/2023 - Witness and Exhibit List

Witness and Exhibit List

10/26/2023 - Witness and Exhibit List

Motion to Strike

09/07/2023 - Motion to Strike

Motion to Compel

09/05/2023 - Motion to Compel

35 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

11/15/2023

HearingHearing Info; Description: Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: MOTCAL; Hearing Time: 10:15AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/15/2023

DocketDocket Entry: Motion Calendar; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANTS ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/14/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Strike; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: WILLIAMS QUEEN

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/03/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Taking Video Deposition; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/01/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Hearing-; Event Type: Event; Comments: NOVEMBER 15, 2023 AT 10:15AM VIA ZOOM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/01/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Taking Deposition; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/31/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Cancellation of Hearing; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/27/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Witness and Exhibit List; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/26/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Witness and Exhibit List; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Strike; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
36 More Docket Entries
05/05/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/05/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/05/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/05/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/05/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/05/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/05/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Lis Pendens; Book/Page: 33693:4576; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/04/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/04/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/04/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less