This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 09/25/2023 at 14:30:32 (UTC).

NAUTILUS INSURANCE COMPANY VS CR MANAGEMENT GROUP LLC

Case Summary

On 05/18/2023 NAUTILUS INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CR MANAGEMENT GROUP LLC. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    05/18/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NAUTILUS INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

CR MANAGEMENT GROUP LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Fisher, Stacey S

Defendant Attorney

Ruiz, Rene Felipe, III

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

05/18/2023 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

05/18/2023 - Complaint

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

05/22/2023 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

05/25/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Service Returned

06/08/2023 - Service Returned

Motion to Dismiss

06/22/2023 - Motion to Dismiss

Notice of Filing:

08/03/2023 - Notice of Filing:

Order Setting CM Deadline

08/22/2023 - Order Setting CM Deadline

Request:

08/28/2023 - Request:

Request for Admissions

08/28/2023 - Request for Admissions

Notice of Interrogatory

08/28/2023 - Notice of Interrogatory

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request:; Event Type: Event; Comments: TO PRODUCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order Setting CM Deadline; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Filing:; Event Type: Event; Comments: COMMERCIAL LINES POLICY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Dismiss; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 5. Parties: CR MANAGEMENT GROUP LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3150261AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:FISHER, STACEY S2775 NE 163RD ST STE 100NORTH MIAMI BEACH FL 33160-407COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:05/24/2023REGISTER#:315CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3140166AMT PAID:$401.00NAME:FISHER, STACEY S2775 NE 163RD ST STE 100NORTH MIAMI BEACH FL 33160-407COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$401.00RECEIPT DATE:05/19/2023REGISTER#:314CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less