This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 06/16/2023 at 09:37:16 (UTC).

LAP PING FOUNG SHIM ET AL VS JENEFFER NATALLY GASKIN-AZUAJE ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/10/2023 LAP PING FOUNG SHIM filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against JENEFFER NATALLY GASKIN-AZUAJE. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Hialeah District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-21

  • Filing Date:

    03/10/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

FOUNG SHIM, LAP PING

Y EL ROUMHEN DE FOUNG, NORELQUIS

Defendants

GASKIN-AZUAJE, JENEFFER NATALLY

All Others in Possession

Not Yet Classified

Property Address

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Larrabure, Maria L

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

03/10/2023 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

03/10/2023 - Complaint

Service Returned

03/22/2023 - Service Returned

Service Returned

03/22/2023 - Service Returned

Answer

03/27/2023 - Answer

Motion to Strike

04/04/2023 - Motion to Strike

Affidavit of Non-Payment

04/04/2023 - Affidavit of Non-Payment

Non-Military Affidavit

04/04/2023 - Non-Military Affidavit

Motion:

04/05/2023 - Motion:

Default Final Judgment

04/05/2023 - Default Final Judgment

Motion to Vacate Judgment

04/13/2023 - Motion to Vacate Judgment

Writ of Possession Issued

04/17/2023 - Writ of Possession Issued

Emergency Motion

04/18/2023 - Emergency Motion

Order:

04/19/2023 - Order:

Response to Motion

04/19/2023 - Response to Motion

Motion for Attorneys Fees

04/21/2023 - Motion for Attorneys Fees

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Attorneys Fees; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response to Motion; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order:; Event Type: Event; Comments: MOTION TO STAY THE WRIT OF POSSESSION IS HEREBY DENIED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Emergency Motion; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Writ of Possession Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Writ of Possession Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: GASKIN-AZUAJE JENEFFER NATALLY; All Others in Possession

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Vacate Judgment; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Default Final Judgment; Event Type: Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Default Final Judgment; Book/Page: 33661:3504; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion:; Event Type: Event; Comments: TO DETERMINE AMOUNT OF RENT TO DEPOSIT INTO REGISTRY OF COURT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 03/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: GASKIN-AZUAJE JENEFFER NATALLY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: All Others in Possession

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3010010AMT PAID:$20.00COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE2$10.00$20.00TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$130.00RECEIPT DATE:03/17/2023REGISTER#:301CASHIER:BEPEREZ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Summons and Complaint Mailed; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: GASKIN-AZUAJE JENEFFER NATALLY; All Others in Possession

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 5 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 5 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: FOUNG SHIM LAP PING; Y EL ROUMHEN DE FOUNG NORELQUIS; GASKIN-AZUAJE JENEFFER NATALLY; All Others in Possession

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3230114AMT PAID:$400.00NAME:LARRABURE, MARIA LSANCHEZ VADILLO, LLP 11402 NW 41ST ST, STE 202DORAL FL 33178COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$400.00$400.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$400.00RECEIPT DATE:03/14/2023REGISTER#:323CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less