This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 11/06/2023 at 12:24:45 (UTC).

ULTRA CARE & DIAGNOSTIC, CORP. VS LYNDON SOUTHERN INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 05/24/2023 ULTRA CARE DIAGNOSTIC, CORP filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against LYNDON SOUTHERN INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Joseph Caleb Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-20

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ultra Care & Diagnostic, Corp.

Assignor

Puerto, Mileydi Riera

Defendant

Lyndon Southern Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Estevez, Marisol

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

05/24/2023 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Statement of Claim

05/24/2023 - Statement of Claim

Request for Production

05/24/2023 - Request for Production

Notice of Interrogatory

05/24/2023 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Admissions

05/24/2023 - Request for Admissions

Notice of Appearance

05/24/2023 - Notice of Appearance

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

05/25/2023 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

05/26/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

05/29/2023 - Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

Notice of Service of Process

06/02/2023 - Notice of Service of Process

Answer and Affirmative Defense

06/16/2023 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

Response to Request for Admissions

06/27/2023 - Response to Request for Admissions

Response to Request for Production

06/27/2023 - Response to Request for Production

Notice of Filing:

07/06/2023 - Notice of Filing:

Motion to Strike

08/15/2023 - Motion to Strike

Notice Of Serving Proposal For Settlement

09/15/2023 - Notice Of Serving Proposal For Settlement

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

09/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Notice Of Serving Proposal For Settlement; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Strike; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Filing:; Event Type: Event; Comments: ANSWERS TO PNS INTERROGATORIES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/27/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Response to Request for Production; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/27/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Response to Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/16/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Answer and Affirmative Defense; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/02/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Service of Process; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/29/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/27/2023

DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3100009AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:ESTEVEZ, MARISOL4770 BISCAYNE BLVD STE 1030MIAMI FL 33137-3232COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:05/27/2023REGISTER#:310CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/26/2023

DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/26/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 8. Parties: Lyndon Southern Insurance Company

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/26/2023

DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3080012AMT PAID:$55.00NAME:ESTEVEZ, MARISOL4770 BISCAYNE BLVD STE 1030MIAMI FL 33137-3232COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$55.00$55.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$55.00RECEIPT DATE:05/26/2023REGISTER#:308CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/24/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/24/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/24/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/24/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/24/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/24/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less