This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 11/12/2023 at 05:07:32 (UTC).

PRISTINE AUTO GLASS, LLC VS STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 03/21/2023 PRISTINE AUTO GLASS, LLC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Coral Gables District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-25

  • Filing Date:

    03/21/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Pristine Auto Glass, Llc

Defendant

State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

Assignee

Henry, Pamela

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Emilio R Stillo

Defendant Attorneys

Atala, Anthony G.

Kruss, Samantha

Lovelady, Hillary

Taylor, Carey E

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

03/21/2023 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Statement of Claim

03/21/2023 - Statement of Claim

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

03/27/2023 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

04/04/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Notice of Service of Process

04/18/2023 - Notice of Service of Process

Notice of Appearance

04/28/2023 - Notice of Appearance

Motion for Extension of Time

05/05/2023 - Motion for Extension of Time

Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

05/22/2023 - Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

Motion for Extension of Time

08/03/2023 - Motion for Extension of Time

Motion to Dismiss

08/03/2023 - Motion to Dismiss

 

Docket Entries

08/03/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Dismiss; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/03/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/22/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/05/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/28/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/18/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Service of Process; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/04/2023

DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/04/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 4. Parties: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/31/2023

DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3141943AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:EMILIO R STILLO7320 GRIFFIN RD STE 203DAVIE FL 33314-4105COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:03/31/2023REGISTER#:314CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/28/2023

DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3172347AMT PAID:$175.00NAME:EMILIO R STILLO7320 GRIFFIN RD STE 203DAVIE FL 33314-4105COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$175.00$175.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$175.00RECEIPT DATE:03/28/2023REGISTER#:317CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/27/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/21/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/21/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less